IL HB5393 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Creates a Provisional Educator License and provides that a Provisional Educator License may be issued to persons who have completed the required education coursework in a State-approved educator preparation program, an educator preparation program approved by another state, or comparable educator program in another country, have completed 2 years of student teaching with satisfactory evaluation of performance, and met any other requirements set by the State Board of Education, but have failed to pass a content area knowledge test under the Code. Provides that a Provisional Educator License is valid for 2 years from the date of issuance and may not be renewed. In provisions concerning educator testing, removes provisions stating that there shall be no exceptions for passing a test of content area knowledge. Removes provisions stating that no candidate shall be allowed to student teach or serve as the teacher of record until he or she has passed the applicable content area test. Sets forth exceptions as to when a candidate seeking licensure may not be required to pass a test of content area knowledge. Provides that a candidate seeking licensure for a Professional Educator License may either complete the required testing under the Code or have held a Provisional Educator License for 2 years (instead of completing the required testing under the Code).
Title
SCH CD-TEACH LICENSE-CONTENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5393&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5393.htm |