WA SB6033 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the prevent or reduce owner-occupied foreclosure program.
Title
Creating the prevent or reduce owner-occupied foreclosure program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-07 | Chapter 386, 2009 Laws PV. | |
2009-05-07 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2009-04-25 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-23 | President signed. | |
2009-04-21 | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-21 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-09 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | FII - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | FII - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-20 | FIHI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-18 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, and Housing & Insurance at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-16 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |