WA SB5985 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the date for allowing certain counties and cities to not plan under the growth management act.
Title
Extending the date for allowing certain counties and cities to not plan under the growth management act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5985&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5985.pdf |