WA SB5834 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding alcoholic beverage regulation.
Title
Regarding alcoholic beverage regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-06 | Chapter 373, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-06 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-21 | President signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 40; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 7. | |
2009-04-20 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-09 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-20 | CL - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-20 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-20 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-09 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-04 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1988 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.