WA SB5832 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-10 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-10 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the prosecution of sex offenses against minor victims until the victim's twenty-eighth birthday if the offense is listed in RCW 9A.04.080(1) (b)(iii)(A) or (c).
Title
Allowing the prosecution of sex offenses against minor victims until the victim's twenty-eighth birthday if the offense is listed in RCW 9A.04.080(1) (b)(iii)(A) or (c).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-10 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-10 | Chapter 61, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-10 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-03 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-03 | President signed. | |
2009-04-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-18 | PSEP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-18 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-18 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-06 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. | |
2009-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-24 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-20 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-04 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |