WA SB5808 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-10 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-10 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the annexation of unincorporated areas served by fire protection districts.
Title
Concerning the annexation of unincorporated areas served by fire protection districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-10 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-10 | Chapter 60, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-10 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-03 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-03 | President signed. | |
2009-04-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-23 | LGH - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-23 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 2; absent, 1; excused, 3. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-06 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-03 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-23 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-12 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-03 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2020 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.