WA SB5779 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the public records exemptions accountability committee.
Title
Concerning the public records exemptions accountability committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] |
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. James McCune [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | SGE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2023-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |