WA SB5680 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-10 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-10 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the property tax exemption for nonprofit artistic, scientific, historical, and performing arts organizations.
Title
Modifying the property tax exemption for nonprofit artistic, scientific, historical, and performing arts organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Jarrett [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Eric Oemig [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
Sen. Joseph Zarelli [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-10 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-10 | Chapter 58, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-10 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-03 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-03 | President signed. | |
2009-04-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-20 | FIN - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-20 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-20 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Finance. | |
2009-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-05 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-28 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |