WA SB5568 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing tax collection tools for the department of revenue in order to promote fairness and administrative efficiency.
Title
Enhancing tax collection tools for the department of revenue in order to promote fairness and administrative efficiency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-30 | Chapter 309, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-30 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-19 | President signed. | |
2009-04-17 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 62; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-17 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-26 | FIN - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-26 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Finance. | |
2009-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 3; absent, 1; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-12 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-12 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-12 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-10 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-09 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-27 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1931 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.