WA SB5547 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning respite care.
Title
Concerning respite care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-30 | Chapter 312, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-30 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-21 | President signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-20 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-01 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-03-27 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-19 | HS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-19 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-16 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Human Services. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-03 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-10 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-10 | HEA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-09 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-05 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-26 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |