WA SB5490 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of express toll lanes in the eastside corridor.
Title
Concerning the use of express toll lanes in the eastside corridor.
Sponsors
Sen. Margarita Prentice [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
Sen. Scott White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-27 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1382 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-16 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5490&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5490.pdf |