WA SB5484 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting Washington's food production system by providing technical assistance in support of improved voluntary environmental stewardship.
Title
Supporting Washington's food production system by providing technical assistance in support of improved voluntary environmental stewardship.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
89 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
89 | 08 | 610 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
89 | 08 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
89 | 08 | 630 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |