WA SB5346 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning administrative procedures for payors and providers of health care services.
Title
Concerning administrative procedures for payors and providers of health care services.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] | Sen. Rosa Franklin [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
Sen. Christopher Marr [D] | Sen. Edward Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-30 | Chapter 298, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-30 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-21 | President signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 43; nays, 0; absent, 3; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-20 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-13 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-04 | WAYS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-04-04 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-04 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-03-26 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-26 | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-06 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2009-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-26 | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-10 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-10 | HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-09 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-20 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1647 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.