WA SB5317 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the payment of certain required costs of the Tacoma Narrows toll bridge.
Title
Concerning the payment of certain required costs of the Tacoma Narrows toll bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5317&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5317.pdf |