WA SB5038 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying notification deadlines for certain education employment contracts and related dates.
Title
Modifying notification deadlines for certain education employment contracts and related dates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2022-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 310 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 405 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 405 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 405 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 405 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |