WA SB5009 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-10 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-10 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a military service exemption for benefits charged to the experience rating accounts of employers.
Title
Creating a military service exemption for benefits charged to the experience rating accounts of employers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-10 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-10 | Chapter 50, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-10 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-03 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-03 | President signed. | |
2009-04-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-17 | CL - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-17 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-13 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-04 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2009-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-02 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-17 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-09 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-05 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2009-12-05 | Prefiled for introduction. |