WA HJR4202 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Constitution to allow seventeen year olds to vote in a primary if they will be eighteen years old by the next general election, and the primary is being held to select the candidates for the November general election.
Title
Amending the Constitution to allow seventeen year olds to vote in a primary if they will be eighteen years old by the next general election, and the primary is being held to select the candidates for the November general election.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Rep. Lynn Kessler [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. David Upthegrove [D] |
Rep. Brendan Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-06 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-26 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=4202&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Joint Resolutions/4202.pdf |