WA HJM4024 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a memorial petitioning for the elimination of the term "mentally retarded" in federal law.
Title
Concerning a memorial petitioning for the elimination of the term "mentally retarded" in federal law.
Sponsors
Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Rep. Deb Wallace [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-25 | HEA - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:30 AM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-13 | Vote on final passage will be reconsidered. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-27 | HS - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-27 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-27 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-15 | First reading, referred to Human Services. |