WA HB2751 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the deduction of union dues and fees.
Title
Concerning the deduction of union dues and fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-23 | House | Chapter 247, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-22 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
Same As/Similar To
SB6296 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.