WA SB6296 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the deduction of union dues and fees.
Title
Concerning the deduction of union dues and fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2751 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.