WA HB2642 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a pilot project to allow wine tasting at farmers markets.
Title
Establishing a pilot project to allow wine tasting at farmers markets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | LCCP - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-26 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-01-26 | CL - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-26 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2010-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2642&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2642.pdf |