WA HB2635 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning collection agency transaction fees for processing electronic payments.
Title
Concerning collection agency transaction fees for processing electronic payments.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Jeremie Dufault [R] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6118 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-23 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2635&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2635.pdf |