WA HB2634 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the powers and duties of the Washington dairy products commission to include research and education related to the economic uses of nutrients produced by dairy farms.
Title
Modifying the powers and duties of the Washington dairy products commission to include research and education related to the economic uses of nutrients produced by dairy farms.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Chapter 101, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | AWRD - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, and Water & Rural Economic Development at 9:00 AM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |
2016-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee recommendations adopted. |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-04 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
SB6343 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.