WA HB2505 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the business and occupation tax exemption for amounts received as credits against contracts with or funds provided by the Bonneville power administration and used for low-income ratepayer assistance and weatherization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the business and occupation tax exemption for amounts received as credits against contracts with or funds provided by the Bonneville power administration and used for low-income ratepayer assistance and weatherization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-03-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-10SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-09SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2020-03-09SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-03-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2020-03-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-06HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-27HouseFIN - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Same As/Similar To

SB6172 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Rules.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback