WA HB2389 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a tax levied and collected on the retail sale of wireless devices used to access the internet.
Title
Concerning a tax levied and collected on the retail sale of wireless devices used to access the internet.
Sponsors
Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Monica Stonier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |