WA HB2248 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding equitable access to the benefits of renewable energy through community solar projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding equitable access to the benefits of renewable energy through community solar projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-12HousePassed final passage; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-11SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-10SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-09SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-09SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-09SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-03-02SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-03-02SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-27HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-27House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-26HousePlaced on second reading.
2020-02-26HouseCommittee relieved of further consideration.
2020-02-21HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-17HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-11HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-11HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment & Energy.
2020-02-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-10HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-04HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-04HouseENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2019-12-18HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB6223 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2248&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2248.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2248-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2248-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2248-S.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120740&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-27-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2248&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120740&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-11-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2248&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120740&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-12-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2248&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback