WA SB6223 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding equitable access to the benefits of renewable energy through community solar projects.
Title
Expanding equitable access to the benefits of renewable energy through community solar projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2248 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6223&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6223.pdf |