WA HB2246 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying specific statutory timelines governing the administration and organization of the joint administrative rules review committee that prescribe when member, alternate, chair, and vice chair appointments and final decisions regarding petitions for review must be made.
Title
Modifying specific statutory timelines governing the administration and organization of the joint administrative rules review committee that prescribe when member, alternate, chair, and vice chair appointments and final decisions regarding petitions for review must be made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-23 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2246&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2246.pdf |