WA HB1969 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the exemption of flood control zone districts that are coextensive with a county from certain limitations upon regular property tax levies.
Title
Concerning the exemption of flood control zone districts that are coextensive with a county from certain limitations upon regular property tax levies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-05-05 | Chapter 275, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-05 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | President signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Passed final passage; yeas, 71; nays, 27; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-18 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2011-04-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-04-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-11 | Floor amendment | |
2011-04-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-04-08 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-04-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-04-01 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-04-01 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-04-01 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-31 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-25 | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-03-24 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-21 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-07 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. | |
2011-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-04 | Floor amendment | |
2011-03-03 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-24 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-24 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-15 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |