WA HB1827 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to expanding the current and future educator workforce supply through evidence-based strategies to improve and incentivize the recruitment and retention of highly effective educators, especially in high-need subject, grade-level, and geographic areas, and to establish a cohesive continuum of high quality professional learning from preparation programs to job embedded induction, mentoring, collaboration, and other professional development opportunities.
Title
Relating to expanding the current and future educator workforce supply through evidence-based strategies to improve and incentivize the recruitment and retention of highly effective educators, especially in high-need subject, grade-level, and geographic areas, and to establish a cohesive continuum of high quality professional learning from preparation programs to job embedded induction, mentoring, collaboration, and other professional development opportunities.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 11:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2018-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-09 | House | 4th substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | APP - Majority; 4th substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-11 | House | ED - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Education. |
2018-01-09 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-06-19 | House | ED - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-06-19 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2017-06-16 | House | Referred to Education. |
2017-06-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-16 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-16 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Education |