WA HB1827 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology.
Pending: House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology.
Pending: House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning pass-through wholesale food distributors.
Title
Concerning pass-through wholesale food distributors.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Larry Crouse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology. |
2014-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-05 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |