WA HB1783 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding dual language and bilingual instruction for early learners through secondary students.
Title
Expanding dual language and bilingual instruction for early learners through secondary students.
Sponsors
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Brady Walkinshaw [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] |
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Education. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2015-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB5675 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.