WA HB1763 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the property tax exemption for property used to provide housing for eligible persons with developmental disabilities.
Title
Modifying the property tax exemption for property used to provide housing for eligible persons with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | HSC - Majority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2017-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |