WA HB1738 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing to protect water quality by aligning state brake friction material restrictions with the requirements of a similar nationwide agreement.
Title
Continuing to protect water quality by aligning state brake friction material restrictions with the requirements of a similar nationwide agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-05 | House | Chapter 204, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-05 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2017-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-07 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |