WA HB1706 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating subminimum wage certificates for persons with disabilities.
Title
Eliminating subminimum wage certificates for persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-13 | House | Chapter 374, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Returned to second reading. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Held on third reading. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5753 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.