WA SB5753 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating subminimum wage certificates for persons with disabilities.
Title
Eliminating subminimum wage certificates for persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1706 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5753&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5753.pdf |