WA HB1606 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing regional fire protection service authorities within the boundaries of regional cities.
Title
Establishing regional fire protection service authorities within the boundaries of regional cities.
Sponsors
Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] |
Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2015-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB5537 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.