WA HB1466 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the expiration date of the public utility tax exemption for certain electrolytic processing businesses.
Title
Extending the expiration date of the public utility tax exemption for certain electrolytic processing businesses.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Jeff Morris [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] |
Rep. Matt Manweller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2017-03-09 | House | TED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-03-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
SB5332 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.