WA HB1454 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Washington state freedom of travel act.
Title
Creating the Washington state freedom of travel act.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Overstreet [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Scott [R] |
Rep. Cary Condotta [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1454&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1454.pdf |