WA HB1422 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the criteria for the beer and wine tasting endorsement for grocery stores.
Title
Changing the criteria for the beer and wine tasting endorsement for grocery stores.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | House | Governor vetoed. |
2013-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2013-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2013-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-11 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-18 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-14 | House | OVER - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-14 | House | OVER - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 9:00 AM. |
2013-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight. |