WA HB1071 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 3/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting personal information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting personal information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseEffective date 3/1/2020.
2019-05-07HouseChapter 241, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-07HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-22HousePassed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2019-04-15SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-15SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-15SenateCommittee amendment
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-09SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-04-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at time TBA.
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-03-26SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-03-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-26SenateENET - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-05SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2019-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-01House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-28HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-06HouseITED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-05HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-01HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-30HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.
2018-12-31HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5064 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-18 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1071&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1071.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1071-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1071-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1071-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117079&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1071&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117079&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1071&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117079&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1071&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback