WA SB5064 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Hearing: Jan 22 @ 10:00 am in Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting personal information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting personal information.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateScheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2018-12-31SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1071 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-16 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback