VT SR0005 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - As adopted by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate resolution strongly opposing the basing of any nuclear weapon delivery system in the State of Vermont

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate resolution strongly opposing the basing of any nuclear weapon delivery system in the State of Vermont

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateAs adopted by Senate
2019-05-23SenateRead 3rd time & adopted
2019-05-23SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-05-22Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-05-22SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 7
2019-05-22SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-22SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2019-05-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-21SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2019-05-20SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-20SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2019-05-17SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-05-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-04-25SenateRead 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Government Operations per Rule 51

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback