VT S0336 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry
Pending: House Agriculture and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry
Pending: House Agriculture and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to establishing standards for the sale of hemp seed
Title
An act relating to establishing standards for the sale of hemp seed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Agriculture |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2020-02-26 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Agriculture on motion of Senator Starr |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Rules suspended on motion of Senator Starr |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |