VT S0310 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Senate Message: Signed by Governor May 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Senate Message: Signed by Governor May 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to natural disaster government response, recovery, and resiliency
Title
An act relating to natural disaster government response, recovery, and resiliency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | House | Senate Message: Signed by Governor May 30, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2024-05-09 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2024-05-09 | House | Rules suspended and resolution messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2024-05-09 | House | Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2024-05-09 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2024-05-09 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment to House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-05-08 | House | Senate Message: Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2024-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Clarkson, Hardy, Norris, Watson, White, and Vyhovsky |
2024-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2024-05-08 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2024-05-07 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2024-05-07 | House | Read third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-05-07 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell and McCarthy of St. Albans City moved to amend the bill, which was agreed to |
2024-05-07 | House | Rep. McGill of Bridport moved to amend the bill, which was agreed to |
2024-05-07 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-05-06 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-05-06 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs, as amended, agreed to |
2024-05-06 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-05-06 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2024-05-06 | House | Rep. Demrow of Corinth recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-05-06 | House | Rep. Birong of Vergennes reported for the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |
2024-05-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-05-06 | House | Action Calendar: Unfinished Business |
2024-05-04 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-05-03 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-05-01 | House | Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-04-23 | House | Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2024-04-04 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Hardy |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Hardy |
2024-04-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Senator Hardy requested & granted leave to withdraw recommendation of amendment |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Consideration resumed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Pending question: Shall the recommendation of amendment of the Committee on Finance be substituted as offered by Sens. Hardy et al?? |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Consideration interrupted by adjournment |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senator(s) Hardy, Clarkson, Vyhovsky, Watson, and White motion to substitute amendment for Committee on Finance recommendation of amendment; text |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Perchlik for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hardy for Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Hardy |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |