VT S0189 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 15, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 15, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Expanding Confidentiality Of Cases Accepted By The Court Diversion Project
Title
An Act Relating To Expanding Confidentiality Of Cases Accepted By The Court Diversion Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on May 15, 2012 | |
2012-05-03 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2012-05-03 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-03 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2012-05-03 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Nitka for Committee, text | |
2012-05-03 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-03 | Committee of Conference Report | |
2012-05-03 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-05-02 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) | |
2012-05-02 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-05-01 | House message House appointed Conference Committee members | |
2012-04-30 | Speaker appointed Grad of Moretown, Waite-Simpson of Essex and Reis of St. Johnsbury as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2012-04-30 | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-04-28 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Nitka, Sears, and Snelling | |
2012-04-28 | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Sears | |
2012-04-28 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-28 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-27 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-26 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-25 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-25 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-24 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-24 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-24 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-20 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-20 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2012-04-19 | Rep. Rep. Reis of St. Johnsbury reported for the committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-20 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-13 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Carris | |
2012-03-02 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2012-03-02 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-01 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-03-01 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2012-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-01 | Reported favorably by Senator Snelling for Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-01 | Reported favorably by Senator Snelling for Committee on Judiciary with recommendation of amendment | |
2012-03-01 | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-01 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-02-29 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-02-28 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-02-24 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-02-23 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-02-22 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-02-16 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-21 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-02-17 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-02-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary | |
2012-02-14 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |