VT S0108 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 20, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 20, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Effective Strategies To Reduce Criminal Recidivism
Title
An Act Relating To Effective Strategies To Reduce Criminal Recidivism
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on May 20, 2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to Governor on May 17, 2011 | |
2011-05-06 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2011-05-06 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-06 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2011-05-06 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text | |
2011-05-06 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-06 | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment | |
2011-05-06 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-06 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Emmons of Springfield | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-04 | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Sears | |
2011-05-04 | Senator(s) Sears motion to substitute proposal of amendment; text | |
2011-05-04 | Motion by Senator Sears to reconsider vote taken whereby Senate concurred in House proposal of amendment with further proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2011-05-04 | Motion disagreed to | |
2011-05-04 | Pending Question: Shall the Rules be suspended and bill messaged to the House forthwith as moved by Senator Carris? | |
2011-05-04 | Motion by Senator Sears to reconsider vote taken whereby Senate suspended Rules to message bill to House forthwith agreed to | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended on motion of Senator Sears to permit motion to reconsider prior vote of Senate to suspend rules to message bill to House forthwith | |
2011-05-03 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Carris | |
2011-05-03 | Motion agreed to | |
2011-05-03 | Motion by Senator Sears that Senate concur in House Proposal of Amendment with further proposal of amendment | |
2011-05-03 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2011-05-03 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-03 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2011-05-03 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-05-02 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-04-29 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2011-04-28 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-04-28 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 102, Nays = 32 | |
2011-04-28 | Report of Committee on Corrections and Institutions as amended agreed to | |
2011-04-28 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Emmons of Springfield agreed to | |
2011-04-28 | Amendment of Committee on Appropriations agreed to | |
2011-04-27 | Rep. Rep. Acinapura of Brandon reported for the committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-27 | Rep. Rep. Emmons of Springfield reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions | |
2011-04-28 | Read Second Time | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) | |
2011-04-20 | Committed to Committee on Corrections and Institutions by motion of Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg | |
2011-04-15 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-14 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Sears | |
2011-04-14 | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 0 | |
2011-04-14 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Sears | |
2011-04-14 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-04-14 | Recommendation of amendment, as amended agreed to | |
2011-04-14 | Recommendation of amendment agreed to | |
2011-04-14 | Senator(s) Sears motion to amend recommendation of amendment; text | |
2011-04-14 | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Illuzzi, text | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-14 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Kitchel | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 | |
2011-04-14 | Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-04-14 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |