VT S0098 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 24 House Committee on Health Care Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 24 House Committee on Health Care Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to Green Mountain Care Board authority over prescription drug costs
Title
An act relating to Green Mountain Care Board authority over prescription drug costs
Sponsors
Sen. Kesha Ram Hinsdale [D] | Sen. Ann Cummings [D] | Sen. Martine Gulick [D] | Sen. Nader Hashim [D] |
Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] | Sen. Mark MacDonald [D] | Sen. Anne Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Lyons, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 5 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-03-29 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Lyons, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 5 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |