VT S0036 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 22 2021 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 22 2021 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to modifications to the use of certain Coronavirus Relief Fund appropriations
Title
An act relating to modifications to the use of certain Coronavirus Relief Fund appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2021-01-22 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-01-21 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Kitchel, Balint, Baruth, Cummings, Nitka, Sears, Sirotkin, Starr, and Westman, text |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Kitchel, Balint, Baruth, Cummings, Nitka, Sears, Sirotkin, Starr, and Westman |
2021-01-21 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |