VT JRS059 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution supporting the Gettysburg Battlefield Preservation Association’s effort to preserve the Camp Letterman hospital site
Title
Joint resolution supporting the Gettysburg Battlefield Preservation Association’s effort to preserve the Camp Letterman hospital site
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2018-05-11 | Senate | House message House adopted in concurrence |
2018-05-10 | House | Adopted in Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | Read first time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate Message, Adopted in concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Adopted on the part of the Senate |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Joint Resolutions for Adoption |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Joint Resolutions for Adoption |
2018-05-05 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2018/J.R.S.59 |
Text | http://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2018/Docs/ACTS/ACTR488/ACTR488%20As%20Adopted.pdf |